Wiener SC 1997/1998
CityVienna
Full nameWiener Sport-Club
Foundation1911
Dissolution year2001
Official websitehttp://www.wsc.at
Roster Wiener SC 1997/1998
Defenders
left on : 31/01/1998
B.date | 07/10/1962 |
Age | 35 years |
Height | 1m86 |
Weight | 90 kg |
left on : 01/07/1998
B.date | 25/01/1971 |
Age | 27 years |
Height | 1m80 |
Weight | 73 kg |
left on : 01/01/1998
B.date | 01/03/1977 |
Age | 21 years |
Height | 1m81 |
Weight | 79 kg |
Midfielders
left on : 01/07/1998
B.date | 03/06/1970 |
Age | 28 years |
Height | 1m70 |
left on : 01/07/1998
B.date | 14/12/1958 |
Age | 39 years |
Height | 1m83 |
Weight | 78 kg |
Forwards
left on : 01/07/1999
B.date | 02/08/1965 |
Age | 32 years |
Height | 1m75 |
Weight | 69 kg |
left on : 01/07/1998
B.date | 30/03/1970 |
Age | 28 years |
Height | 1m76 |
Weight | 72 kg |
left on : 01/07/1998
B.date | 09/06/1971 |
Age | 27 years |
Manager
Transfers: In
Players in | |||||
30/06 | 30/06/1997 | Jürgen Bruck | Bruck | Return from loan | |
01/07 | 01/07/1997 | Walter Binder | Wiener Neudorf | ||
01/07 | 01/07/1997 | Jessenitschnig | Donaufeld | ||
01/07 | 01/07/1997 | Michael Keller | FC Stadlau | ||
01/07 | 01/07/1997 | M. Majstorovic | Stockerau | ||
01/07 | 01/07/1997 | C. Scheuch | Schwechat | ||
01/01 | 01/01/1998 | T. Griessler | SV Gerasdorf | ||
01/01 | 01/01/1998 | Daniel Kriwitz | SKA Klagenfurt | ||
Staff members in | |||||
01/01 | 01/01/1998 | Gernot ZIrngast | Donaufeld | manager |
Transfers: Out
Players out | |||||
01/07 | 01/07/1997 | Damir Canadi | Schwechat | ||
01/07 | 01/07/1997 | E. Dampfhofer | Leoben | ||
01/07 | 01/07/1997 | M. Eberhardt | Stockerau | ||
01/07 | 01/07/1997 | Mario Handl | First Vienna | ||
01/07 | 01/07/1997 | Robert Hoffmann | Unknown | ||
01/07 | 01/07/1997 | G. Jerabek | Horn | ||
01/07 | 01/07/1997 | Manfred Nastl | Horn | ||
01/07 | 01/07/1997 | Peter Paluch | First Vienna | ||
01/07 | 01/07/1997 | Frank Schmidt | First Vienna | ||
15/07 | 15/07/1997 | Jürgen Bruck | Parndorf | ||
01/01 | 01/01/1998 | M. Majstorovic | SV Gerasdorf | ||
31/01 | 31/01/1998 | Michael Keller | Leobendorf | ||
Players retired | |||||
01/07 | 01/07/1997 | K. Böttcher | Retired | ||
01/07 | 01/07/1997 | S. Burringer | Retired | ||
Staff members out | |||||
01/07 | 01/07/1997 | Felix Latzke | Ostbahn XI | manager | |
31/12 | 31/12/1997 | A. Reisinger | FAC TfW | manager |
Last 10 years rankingLast updated on 31/08/2024 at 17:42
This ranking is calculated on the total of league games of the country between 1988 and 1998 weighted by the tier of the competition teams played for. The points per match are calculated on the basis of a 3-point victory and a 1-point draw.
8 | Tirol Innsbruck | 1.52 pts/m | |
9 | VSE St. Pölten | 1.18 pts/m | |
10 | Grazer AK | 1.5 pts/m | |
11 | LASK Linz | 1.23 pts/m | |
12 | First Vienna | 1.45 pts/m | |
13 | Wiener SC | 1.06 pts/m | |
14 | Ried | 1.41 pts/m | |
15 | FC Linz | 1.21 pts/m | |
16 | VfB Mödling | 1.13 pts/m | |
17 | Leoben | 1.14 pts/m | |
18 | Austria Lustenau | 1.49 pts/m |
First data collected by footballdatabase.eu on the 22/07/1988. All information before this date, if they exist, might be missing.
Comments