Truro City 2013/2014
CityTruro
Full nameTruro City FC
Diminutive Truro
Foundation1889
Stadium Treyew Road
Official websitehttp://www.trurocityfc.co.uk
Roster Truro City 2013/2014
Goalkeepers
left on : 29/04/2014
B.date | 17/02/1992 |
Age | 22 years |
Height | 1m85 |
Weight | 74 kg |
Defenders
left on : 01/07/2017
B.date | 08/09/1978 |
Age | 35 years |
Height | 1m83 |
left on : 01/07/2018
B.date | 03/08/1989 |
Age | 24 years |
Height | 1m96 |
left on : 15/11/2014
B.date | 18/04/1987 |
Age | 27 years |
Height | 1m83 |
left on : 02/06/2016
B.date | 10/02/1980 |
Age | 34 years |
Height | 1m75 |
B.date | 1989 |
Age | 25 years |
Midfielders
left on : 01/07/2016
B.date | 24/08/1982 |
Age | 31 years |
Height | 1m80 |
left on : 29/04/2014
B.date | 29/09/1993 |
Age | 20 years |
Height | 1m78 |
Forwards
left on : 01/11/2014
B.date | 06/12/1985 |
Age | 28 years |
Height | 1m78 |
left on : 22/06/2018
B.date | 02/03/1993 |
Age | 21 years |
Height | 1m85 |
Manager
Staff members
Graeme Kirkup | Arrived on : 06/06/2013 |
assistant manager | Left on : 12/03/2014 |
Transfers: In
Players in | |||||
06/06 | 06/06/2013 | Ollie Chenoweth | Free | ||
06/06 | 06/06/2013 | Jared Sims | Free | ||
12/09 | 12/09/2013 | Jamie Lowry | Free | ||
05/10 | 05/10/2013 | Arran Pugh | Dorchester | ||
05/10 | 05/10/2013 | Ben Watson | Dorchester | ||
11/10 | 11/10/2013 | Steve Tully | Tiverton | ||
Staff members in | |||||
06/06 | 06/06/2013 | Graeme Kirkup | assistant manager | ||
13/03 | 13/03/2014 | Steve Tully | Tiverton | manager |
Transfers: Out
Players out | |||||
29/05 | 29/05/2013 | Matt Wright | Tiverton | ||
03/06 | 03/06/2013 | Ben Gerring | Bideford | ||
28/06 | 28/06/2013 | Lee Hodges | Unknown | ||
01/07 | 01/07/2013 | Adam Kelly | Tiverton | ||
01/07 | 01/07/2013 | Andy Watkins | Bath City | ||
01/07 | 01/07/2013 | Stewart Yetton | Weymouth | ||
01/08 | 01/08/2013 | Barry Hayles | Arlesey Town | ||
Staff members out | |||||
03/05 | 03/05/2013 | Lee Hodges | Free | manager | |
12/03 | 12/03/2014 | Graeme Kirkup | Free | assistant manager | |
12/03 | 12/03/2014 | Steve Massey | Retired | manager |
Comments