Torpedo Vladimir 2007
CityVladimir
Full nameFC Torpedo Vladimir
Diminutive Torpedo Vladimir
Foundation1959
Stadium Torpedo
Official websitehttp://www.fc-tv.ru/
Roster Torpedo Vladimir 2007
Goalkeepers
left on : 01/03/2010
B.date | 21/11/1986 |
Age | 20 years |
Height | 1m88 |
Weight | 86 kg |
Defenders
left on : 01/01/2011
B.date | 04/12/1976 |
Age | 30 years |
Height | 1m80 |
Weight | 80 kg |
left on : 03/08/2012
B.date | 17/01/1982 |
Age | 25 years |
Height | 1m86 |
Weight | 81 kg |
left on : 01/01/2010
B.date | 11/01/1972 |
Age | 35 years |
Height | 1m82 |
Weight | 77 kg |
left on : 18/07/2012
B.date | 14/08/1990 |
Age | 16 years |
Height | 1m83 |
Weight | 71 kg |
left on : 09/06/2012
B.date | 09/11/1986 |
Age | 20 years |
Height | 1m73 |
Weight | 66 kg |
Midfielders
left on : 01/07/2012
B.date | 23/01/1974 |
Age | 33 years |
Height | 1m78 |
Weight | 77 kg |
left on : 01/12/2007
B.date | 19/05/1989 |
Age | 18 years |
Height | 1m90 |
Weight | 83 kg |
left on : 11/07/2012
B.date | 25/01/1982 |
Age | 25 years |
Height | 1m84 |
Weight | 82 kg |
left on : 01/12/2007
B.date | 04/05/1985 |
Age | 22 years |
Height | 1m73 |
Weight | 69 kg |
left on : 01/01/2011
B.date | 12/06/1980 |
Age | 27 years |
Height | 1m77 |
Weight | 74 kg |
left on : 01/01/2009
B.date | 17/03/1989 |
Age | 18 years |
Height | 1m72 |
Weight | 66 kg |
left on : 01/01/2011
B.date | 11/06/1983 |
Age | 24 years |
Height | 1m70 |
Weight | 66 kg |
left on : 01/01/2008
B.date | 26/07/1970 |
Age | 36 years |
Height | 1m94 |
Weight | 82 kg |
Forwards
left on : 01/01/2011
B.date | 27/09/1972 |
Age | 34 years |
Height | 1m84 |
Weight | 72 kg |
left on : 05/07/2012
B.date | 27/03/1980 |
Age | 27 years |
Height | 1m86 |
Weight | 74 kg |
left on : 01/07/2012
B.date | 23/08/1981 |
Age | 25 years |
Height | 1m87 |
Weight | 87 kg |
Manager
Transfers: In
Players in | |||||
01/01 | 01/01/2007 | Andrey Konov | |||
01/01 | 01/01/2007 | Sergey Shalin | |||
01/01 | 01/01/2007 | A. Tyurgashkin | Spartak Kostroma | ||
01/01 | 01/01/2007 | Pavel Vtyurin | Kooperator Vichuga | ||
Players loaned in | |||||
01/01 | 01/01/2007 | E. Falkovskiy | Torpedo | Loan | |
01/08 | 01/08/2007 | D. Zinovich | Shinnik B | Loan | |
Staff members in | |||||
Transfers: Out
Players out | |||||
01/01 | 01/01/2007 | S. Chasovskiy | Elets | ||
Players retired | |||||
01/01 | 01/01/2007 | S. Kriulin | Retired | ||
Staff members out | |||||
14/12 | 14/12/2006 | Oleg Stogov | Free | manager |
Comments