Gazovik Orenburg 2006
CityOrenburg
Full nameFC Gazovik Orenburg
Diminutive Gazovik Or
Foundation1976
Stadium Gazovik
Official websitehttp://fcorenburg.ru/
Roster Gazovik Orenburg 2006
Goalkeepers
left on : 01/01/2008
B.date | 03/09/1980 |
Age | 25 years |
Height | 1m84 |
Weight | 80 kg |
left on : 01/01/2012
B.date | 23/11/1987 |
Age | 18 years |
Height | 1m90 |
Weight | 84 kg |
left on : 01/01/2007
B.date | 13/10/1974 |
Age | 31 years |
Height | 1m85 |
Weight | 82 kg |
Defenders
left on : 01/01/2007
B.date | 06/08/1981 |
Age | 24 years |
Height | 1m88 |
Weight | 77 kg |
left on : 01/12/2006
B.date | 18/06/1981 |
Age | 25 years |
Height | 1m91 |
Weight | 86 kg |
left on : 01/01/2007
B.date | 18/07/1982 |
Age | 23 years |
Height | 1m78 |
Weight | 77 kg |
left on : 01/01/2012
B.date | 11/07/1975 |
Age | 30 years |
Height | 1m76 |
Weight | 74 kg |
Midfielders
left on : 18/06/2012
B.date | 26/08/1984 |
Age | 21 years |
Height | 1m85 |
Weight | 80 kg |
left on : 01/01/2007
B.date | 11/01/1982 |
Age | 24 years |
Height | 1m76 |
Weight | 70 kg |
Forwards
left on : 01/07/2008
B.date | 27/01/1983 |
Age | 23 years |
Height | 1m78 |
Weight | 70 kg |
left on : 01/01/2010
B.date | 13/10/1987 |
Age | 18 years |
Height | 1m80 |
Weight | 81 kg |
left on : 01/02/2010
B.date | 27/12/1989 |
Age | 16 years |
Height | 1m83 |
Weight | 78 kg |
left on : 01/01/2007
B.date | 18/12/1975 |
Age | 30 years |
Height | 1m68 |
Weight | 68 kg |
left on : 01/01/2007
B.date | 10/02/1980 |
Age | 26 years |
Height | 1m80 |
Weight | 73 kg |
Manager
Staff members
Ilshat Aytkulov | Arrived on : 27/07/2006 |
assistant manager | Left on : 16/06/2009 |
Ilshat Aytkulov | Arrived on : 28/11/2005 |
assistant manager | Left on : 14/06/2006 |
Transfers: In
Players in | |||||
01/01 | 01/01/2006 | Sergey Dymov | Lokomotiv NN. | ||
01/01 | 01/01/2006 | Karatlyashev | Torpedo Volzhskiy | ||
01/01 | 01/01/2006 | V. Karpukhin | |||
01/01 | 01/01/2006 | E. Khlebodarov | Alnas | ||
01/01 | 01/01/2006 | V. Kleymenov | Lokomotiv NN. | ||
01/01 | 01/01/2006 | Anton Labutin | |||
01/01 | 01/01/2006 | Miroshnichenko | Unknown | ||
01/01 | 01/01/2006 | Marat Shogenov | Torpedo Volzhskiy | ||
01/01 | 01/01/2006 | Stepan Suvorov | Neftyanik Ufa | ||
01/07 | 01/07/2006 | Denis Pavlov | Nosta | Free | |
01/07 | 01/07/2006 | Podolyanchik | Nosta | ||
Players loaned in | |||||
01/07 | 01/07/2006 | Denis Shevelev | Zvezda Irkutsk | Loan | |
Staff members in | |||||
01/07 | 01/07/2006 | A. Averianov | Atyrau | manager |
Transfers: Out
Players out | |||||
01/01 | 01/01/2006 | V. Fedotov | Zenit Penza | ||
01/01 | 01/01/2006 | Andrey Samoylov | Caspiy | ||
Players retired | |||||
01/01 | 01/01/2006 | Oleg Semin | Retired | ||
Staff members out | |||||
Comments