Villarrobledo 2011/2012
CityVillarrobledo
Full nameCP Villarrobledo
Diminutive Villa
Foundation1958
Stadium Virgen de la Caridad
Official websitehttps://www.cpvillarrobledo.net/
Roster Villarrobledo 2011/2012
Goalkeepers
left on : 08/08/2014
B.date | 25/10/1978 |
Age | 33 years |
Height | 1m80 |
Weight | 79 kg |
Defenders
left on : 03/07/2013
B.date | 12/08/1980 |
Age | 31 years |
Height | 1m79 |
Weight | 74 kg |
left on : 09/09/2013
B.date | 19/06/1985 |
Age | 27 years |
Height | 1m85 |
left on : 01/07/2013
B.date | 02/10/1976 |
Age | 35 years |
Height | 1m85 |
Weight | 80 kg |
left on : 01/07/2013
B.date | 06/03/1987 |
Age | 25 years |
Height | 1m80 |
Weight | 69 kg |
left on : 01/07/2013
B.date | 13/12/1978 |
Age | 33 years |
Height | 1m80 |
left on : 17/07/2012
B.date | 18/12/1986 |
Age | 25 years |
Height | 1m65 |
Weight | 72 kg |
left on : 01/07/2012
B.date | 04/01/1983 |
Age | 29 years |
Height | 1m81 |
Weight | 70 kg |
left on : 01/07/2014
B.date | 04/12/1988 |
Age | 23 years |
Height | 1m75 |
Weight | 66 kg |
Midfielders
left on : 17/07/2017
B.date | 02/06/1988 |
Age | 24 years |
Height | 1m56 |
Weight | 56 kg |
left on : 01/07/2013
B.date | 13/04/1982 |
Age | 30 years |
Height | 1m80 |
Weight | 67 kg |
left on : 13/06/2012
B.date | 06/12/1985 |
Age | 26 years |
Height | 1m71 |
Weight | 72 kg |
left on : 01/07/2014
B.date | 14/01/1984 |
Age | 28 years |
Height | 1m77 |
left on : 01/07/2014
B.date | 05/07/1990 |
Age | 21 years |
Height | 1m77 |
Weight | 74 kg |
Forwards
left on : 11/07/2012
B.date | 04/05/1988 |
Age | 24 years |
Height | 1m74 |
Weight | 65 kg |
left on : 02/07/2013
B.date | 05/07/1989 |
Age | 22 years |
Height | 1m84 |
Weight | 73 kg |
left on : 01/01/2012
B.date | 01/07/1981 |
Age | 31 years |
Height | 1m85 |
Weight | 70 kg |
Manager
Staff members
Agus | Arrived on : 01/07/2010 |
fitness coach |
Transfers: In
Players in | |||||
01/07 | 01/07/2011 | R. L. Isma | Albacete B | ||
07/07 | 07/07/2011 | Cuqui | Arroyo | ||
08/07 | 08/07/2011 | Niche | Binéfar | ||
11/07 | 11/07/2011 | José Mari | La Roda | ||
13/07 | 13/07/2011 | Moreno Castro | La Roda | Free | |
14/07 | 14/07/2011 | Alex | Antequera | ||
25/07 | 25/07/2011 | Borja Collado | Villanovense | ||
25/07 | 25/07/2011 | Cubi | Toledo | ||
27/07 | 27/07/2011 | De las Heras | Getafe B | ||
06/08 | 06/08/2011 | Carlos Alfaro | La Roda | ||
11/08 | 11/08/2011 | S. D. Djily | Toledo | ||
02/01 | 02/01/2012 | A. Alberto | Albacete | Free | |
04/01 | 04/01/2012 | David Parra | Illescas |
Transfers: Out
Players out | |||||
01/07 | 01/07/2011 | Carlitos Seidi | Padroense | ||
04/07 | 04/07/2011 | Mario Sánchez | Leioa | ||
01/01 | 01/01/2012 | Cuqui | Plasencia | ||
Players retired | |||||
01/07 | 01/07/2011 | Antonio David | Retired | ||
Staff members out | |||||
01/07 | 01/07/2011 | Arsenal Moreno | Martos | manager |
Comments