Linlithgow Rose 2017/2018
CityLinlithgow
Full nameLinlithgow Rose FC
Diminutive Linlithgow
Foundation1889
Stadium Prestonfield
Official websitehttp://www.linlithgowrose.co.uk
Roster Linlithgow Rose 2017/2018
Goalkeepers
left on : 01/07/2018
B.date | 27/12/1980 |
Age | 37 years |
Height | 1m86 |
Weight | 82 kg |
left on : 22/10/2018
B.date | 06/01/1981 |
Age | 37 years |
left on : 01/07/2018
B.date | 03/12/1981 |
Age | 36 years |
Height | 1m85 |
Weight | 89 kg |
Defenders
left on : 01/07/2020
B.date | 08/05/1986 |
Age | 32 years |
Height | 1m85 |
left on : 13/08/2018
B.date | 05/12/1987 |
Age | 30 years |
Height | 1m88 |
left on : 01/07/2020
B.date | 13/05/1991 |
Age | 27 years |
Height | 1m83 |
Weight | 70 kg |
left on : 01/07/2018
B.date | 11/04/1984 |
Age | 34 years |
Height | 1m78 |
Weight | 64 kg |
left on : 01/07/2019
B.date | 22/01/1995 |
Age | 23 years |
Midfielders
left on : 01/07/2019
B.date | 13/06/1992 |
Age | 26 years |
left on : 01/07/2019
B.date | 24/03/1988 |
Age | 30 years |
left on : 16/11/2021
B.date | 26/03/1988 |
Age | 30 years |
Height | 1m75 |
left on : 23/01/2018
B.date | 06/04/1997 |
Age | 21 years |
B.date | 08/02/1993 |
Age | 25 years |
Height | 1m80 |
Weight | 74 kg |
Forwards
left on : 01/07/2019
B.date | 14/07/1983 |
Age | 34 years |
Height | 1m73 |
left on : 01/10/2021
B.date | 30/05/1987 |
Age | 31 years |
Height | 1m83 |
left on : 01/07/2020
B.date | 03/05/1989 |
Age | 29 years |
Height | 1m73 |
left on : 01/07/2021
B.date | 03/12/1985 |
Age | 32 years |
Manager
Staff members
Paul Ronald | Arrived on : 22/05/2017 |
assistant manager | Left on : 29/09/2019 |
Steven Hislop | Arrived on : 17/11/2016 |
assistant manager | Left on : 02/05/2017 |
Andy Carlin | Arrived on : 01/01/2018 |
goalkeeping coach | Left on : 22/10/2018 |
Transfers: In
Players in | |||||
25/11 | 25/11/2016 | Mark Williams | Cumnock Juniors | ||
07/01 | 07/01/2017 | Sean Muhsin | Edinburgh C. | ||
27/01 | 27/01/2017 | Sam Davidson | Stirling Albion | ||
01/03 | 01/03/2017 | Stewart Devine | Bo'ness | ||
01/07 | 01/07/2017 | Iain Gray | Kilbirnie | ||
01/07 | 01/07/2017 | Roddy MacLennan | Bo'ness | ||
01/07 | 01/07/2017 | Cammy McClair | Free | Free | |
01/07 | 01/07/2017 | Ruari McLennan | Bo'ness | ||
01/07 | 01/07/2017 | Martyn Shields | Kilsyth | ||
01/07 | 01/07/2017 | Robert Sloan | Bo'ness | ||
01/07 | 01/07/2017 | C. Strickland | Bo'ness | ||
01/07 | 01/07/2017 | Kyle Turnbull | Albion Rovers | ||
01/01 | 01/01/2018 | Andy Carlin | Meadow XI | ||
31/01 | 31/01/2018 | Luke Whelan | Queen's Park | ||
Staff members in | |||||
17/11 | 17/11/2016 | Steven Hislop | Welfare | assistant manager | |
22/05 | 22/05/2017 | Mark Bradley | Unknown | manager | |
22/05 | 22/05/2017 | Paul Ronald | Kilbirnie | assistant manager | |
01/01 | 01/01/2018 | Andy Carlin | Meadow XI | goalkeeping coach |
Transfers: Out
Players out | |||||
01/01 | 01/01/2017 | T. McAllister | Unknown | ||
09/01 | 09/01/2017 | Andrew Shirra | Sauchie | ||
23/02 | 23/02/2017 | B. Donaldson | Musselburgh | ||
23/02 | 23/02/2017 | B. Donaldson | Musselburgh | ||
25/02 | 25/02/2017 | Joe Hamill | Unknown | ||
15/05 | 15/05/2017 | Sam Davidson | Stirling Albion | ||
01/07 | 01/07/2017 | Jack Beaumont | Unknown | ||
01/07 | 01/07/2017 | Reece Donaldson | Selkirk | ||
01/07 | 01/07/2017 | Kevin Kelbie | Stirlingshire | ||
01/07 | 01/07/2017 | Connor Kelly | Broxburn | ||
01/07 | 01/07/2017 | Robbie McNab | BSC Glasgow | ||
01/07 | 01/07/2017 | John Ovenstone | Cowdenbeath | ||
01/07 | 01/07/2017 | Lewis Small | Unknown | ||
02/07 | 02/07/2017 | Ross Gray | Rose | ||
04/07 | 04/07/2017 | Sean Muhsin | Selkirk | ||
23/01 | 23/01/2018 | Cammy McClair | Clydebank | ||
Players retired | |||||
01/07 | 01/07/2017 | Graham Weir | Retired | ||
Players released | |||||
01/07 | 01/07/2017 | Jackie Myles | Free | ||
01/07 | 01/07/2017 | Mark Williams | Free | ||
Staff members out | |||||
03/10 | 03/10/2016 | David McGlynn | Free | manager | |
02/05 | 02/05/2017 | Steven Hislop | Broxburn | assistant manager | |
02/05 | 02/05/2017 | Todd Lumsden | Free | manager |
Comments