Salyut-Energia Belgorod 2003
CityBelgorod
Full nameFC Salyut-Energia Belgorod
Diminutive Belgorod
Foundation1960
Stadium Salyut
Official websitehttp://www.fc-salute.ru/
Roster Salyut-Energia Belgorod 2003
Goalkeepers
left on : 15/08/2010
B.date | 13/09/1986 |
Age | 16 years |
Height | 1m95 |
Weight | 91 kg |
left on : 01/01/2004
B.date | 17/10/1969 |
Age | 33 years |
Height | 1m97 |
Weight | 90 kg |
Defenders
left on : 01/07/2009
B.date | 02/09/1974 |
Age | 28 years |
Height | 1m84 |
left on : 01/01/2004
B.date | 29/01/1971 |
Age | 32 years |
Height | 1m80 |
Weight | 77 kg |
left on : 01/01/2006
B.date | 18/04/1976 |
Age | 27 years |
Height | 1m76 |
Weight | 69 kg |
Midfielders
left on : 01/01/2004
B.date | 18/11/1971 |
Age | 31 years |
Height | 1m84 |
Weight | 80 kg |
left on : 01/01/2006
B.date | 18/11/1978 |
Age | 24 years |
Height | 1m78 |
Weight | 75 kg |
left on : 01/01/2004
B.date | 10/11/1972 |
Age | 30 years |
Height | 1m82 |
Weight | 76 kg |
left on : 01/06/2007
B.date | 05/11/1975 |
Age | 27 years |
Height | 1m82 |
Weight | 76 kg |
left on : 01/01/2005
B.date | 24/06/1972 |
Age | 31 years |
Height | 1m72 |
Weight | 73 kg |
left on : 01/01/2004
B.date | 22/05/1976 |
Age | 27 years |
Height | 1m82 |
Weight | 75 kg |
left on : 01/01/2004
B.date | 26/06/1972 |
Age | 31 years |
Height | 1m72 |
Weight | 70 kg |
left on : 01/01/2004
B.date | 14/06/1977 |
Age | 26 years |
Height | 1m75 |
Weight | 72 kg |
left on : 01/01/2004
B.date | 04/12/1967 |
Age | 35 years |
Height | 1m79 |
Weight | 74 kg |
Forwards
left on : 01/01/2005
B.date | 29/03/1968 |
Age | 35 years |
Height | 1m78 |
Weight | 76 kg |
left on : 01/01/2004
B.date | 01/04/1976 |
Age | 27 years |
Height | 1m83 |
Weight | 75 kg |
left on : 01/01/2004
B.date | 06/06/1973 |
Age | 30 years |
Height | 1m80 |
Weight | 74 kg |
left on : 21/07/2003
B.date | 04/11/1975 |
Age | 27 years |
Manager
Transfers: In
Players in | |||||
01/01 | 01/01/2003 | A. Belenov | |||
01/01 | 01/01/2003 | A. Beskrovnyi | Chornomorets | ||
01/01 | 01/01/2003 | Igor Gavrilin | Unknown | ||
01/01 | 01/01/2003 | A. Grishin | Rubin Kazan | ||
01/01 | 01/01/2003 | V. Safronov | Volgar | ||
01/01 | 01/01/2003 | V. Semenov | Irtysh Omsk | ||
01/01 | 01/01/2003 | Gennadiy Semin | Rubin Kazan | ||
01/01 | 01/01/2003 | D. Strachkov | Khimki | ||
01/01 | 01/01/2003 | G. Strikalov | Khimki | ||
01/01 | 01/01/2003 | Igor Zakharov | Fakel | ||
01/07 | 01/07/2003 | V. Timashov | Metallurg Krasnoyarsk | ||
Staff members in | |||||
01/01 | 01/01/2003 | Valeriy Nenenko | Chornomorets | manager | |
17/06 | 17/06/2003 | Sergey Andreev | Chornomorets | manager |
Transfers: Out
Players out | |||||
01/01 | 01/01/2003 | S. Krukovets | Zhenis | ||
01/01 | 01/01/2003 | Maksym Morozov | Fakel | ||
01/01 | 01/01/2003 | A. Ovsyannikov | Ural | ||
01/01 | 01/01/2003 | Shakhnazarov | Unknown | ||
01/01 | 01/01/2003 | M. Trofimov | Kaysar | ||
21/07 | 21/07/2003 | A. Sokolov | Arsenal Tula | ||
Players retired | |||||
01/01 | 01/01/2003 | Armen Adamyan | Retired | ||
Players released | |||||
01/01 | 01/01/2003 | Zheltonozhenko | Free |
Comments