Roster Tafea FC 2004/2005
Goalkeepers
B.date | 10/06/1978 |
Age | 27 years |
B.date | 05/04/1983 |
Age | 22 years |
Defenders
left on : 01/01/2008
B.date | 13/05/1970 |
Age | 35 years |
left on : 01/01/2005
B.date | 09/11/1978 |
Age | 26 years |
Midfielders
left on : 01/07/2010
B.date | 02/04/1978 |
Age | 27 years |
left on : 01/01/2006
B.date | 07/07/1981 |
Age | 23 years |
left on : 01/01/2007
B.date | 25/09/1983 |
Age | 21 years |
left on : 01/01/2005
B.date | 22/05/1979 |
Age | 26 years |
Forwards
left on : 01/07/2006
B.date | 26/01/1977 |
Age | 28 years |
Manager
Transfers: In
Players in | |||||
01/01 | 01/01/2004 | Turei Iautu | |||
01/01 | 01/01/2005 | David Chilia | Tupuji Imere | ||
01/01 | 01/01/2005 | Etienne Mermer | Mitchelton | ||
01/01 | 01/01/2005 | Alphonse Qorig | Shepherds | ||
Staff members in | |||||
01/07 | 01/07/2004 | Marcel Mao | Chad | manager |
Transfers: Out
Players out | |||||
01/01 | 01/01/2004 | G. M. Haitong | Amical FC | ||
01/01 | 01/01/2004 | Freddy Vava | Amical FC | ||
01/07 | 01/07/2004 | Graham Demas | Otago United | ||
01/01 | 01/01/2005 | Turei Iautu | Unknown | ||
Players retired | |||||
01/01 | 01/01/2005 | Tom Manses | Retired |
Comments