Tampico Madero 2008/2009
Roster Tampico Madero 2008/2009
Goalkeepers
left on : 01/01/2009
B.date | 12/05/1979 |
Age | 30 years |
Height | 1m78 |
Weight | 73 kg |
left on : 01/07/2009
B.date | 17/02/1979 |
Age | 30 years |
Height | 1m80 |
Weight | 80 kg |
Defenders
left on : 01/01/2009
B.date | 07/07/1986 |
Age | 22 years |
Height | 1m82 |
Weight | 78 kg |
left on : 30/06/2009
B.date | 19/02/1979 |
Age | 30 years |
Height | 1m80 |
Weight | 81 kg |
left on : 01/07/2009
B.date | 28/05/1977 |
Age | 32 years |
Height | 1m78 |
Weight | 74 kg |
Midfielders
left on : 01/07/2010
B.date | 22/09/1988 |
Age | 20 years |
Height | 1m70 |
Weight | 69 kg |
left on : 01/01/2009
B.date | 24/12/1975 |
Age | 33 years |
Height | 1m72 |
Weight | 68 kg |
left on : 01/01/2009
B.date | 23/01/1984 |
Age | 25 years |
left on : 01/01/2009
B.date | 28/12/1987 |
Age | 21 years |
Height | 1m76 |
Weight | 76 kg |
left on : 01/07/2009
B.date | 29/06/1984 |
Age | 25 years |
Height | 1m72 |
Weight | 65 kg |
left on : 30/06/2009
B.date | 19/03/1983 |
Age | 26 years |
Height | 1m76 |
Weight | 72 kg |
left on : 01/07/2009
B.date | 27/08/1984 |
Age | 24 years |
Height | 1m74 |
Forwards
left on : 01/01/2010
B.date | 24/07/1984 |
Age | 24 years |
Height | 1m82 |
Weight | 78 kg |
left on : 01/07/2009
B.date | 21/07/1982 |
Age | 26 years |
Height | 1m89 |
Weight | 84 kg |
left on : 01/07/2009
B.date | 24/03/1984 |
Age | 25 years |
Height | 1m76 |
Weight | 72 kg |
left on : 01/07/2009
B.date | 27/03/1977 |
Age | 32 years |
Height | 1m81 |
Weight | 80 kg |
left on : 01/01/2009
B.date | 20/12/1980 |
Age | 28 years |
Height | 1m66 |
Weight | 67 kg |
Manager
Staff members
Alejandro Curbelo | Arrived on : 07/03/2009 |
assistant manager | Left on : 30/06/2009 |
Transfers: In
Players in | |||||
01/07 | 01/07/2008 | Bosco Frontán | Querétaro | ||
01/07 | 01/07/2008 | Reinaldo López | Cerro PPF | ||
01/07 | 01/07/2008 | Osvaldo Lucas | Standard | ||
01/07 | 01/07/2008 | Jair Pereira | |||
01/07 | 01/07/2008 | Edmundo Ríos | Petroleros | ||
01/07 | 01/07/2008 | Alberto Rizo | Cruz Azul | ||
01/07 | 01/07/2008 | I. Rodríguez | Standard | ||
01/07 | 01/07/2008 | Jaime Ruiz | Monarcas | ||
01/01 | 01/01/2009 | I. Castillejos | Indios | ||
01/01 | 01/01/2009 | Ibarra | Alacranes | ||
01/01 | 01/01/2009 | E. A. Marín | Potros Chetumal | ||
Players loaned in | |||||
01/01 | 01/01/2009 | Arredondo Fainsod | Alacranes | Loan | |
01/01 | 01/01/2009 | Hugo Meléndez | Monterrey | Loan | |
Staff members in | |||||
07/03 | 07/03/2009 | A. Curbelo | Free | assistant manager | |
07/03 | 07/03/2009 | C. D. Jurado | Free | manager |
Transfers: Out
Players out | |||||
01/07 | 01/07/2008 | Carlos Araujo | Querétaro | ||
01/07 | 01/07/2008 | L. D. Cano | Querétaro | ||
01/07 | 01/07/2008 | Victor Lojero | San Luis | ||
01/07 | 01/07/2008 | Julio Pardini | Cruz Azul | Return from loan | |
01/01 | 01/01/2009 | E. Hernandez | Estudiantes | ||
01/01 | 01/01/2009 | Reinaldo López | Cerro PPF | ||
01/01 | 01/01/2009 | Jair Pereira | Cruz Azul B | ||
01/01 | 01/01/2009 | Edmundo Ríos | Estudiantes | ||
Players loaned out | |||||
01/01 | 01/01/2009 | R. A. García | Estudiantes | Loan | |
Players retired | |||||
01/07 | 01/07/2008 | Gilberto Adame | Retired | ||
01/01 | 01/01/2009 | Jaime Ruiz | Retired |
Trophy room
Victories
Liga MX | 1 | 1953 |
Runner-ups
Liga de Expansión MX | 1 | 2021(Apertura Liga de Expansión) |
Campeón de Campeones Liga de Expansión | 1 | 2021 |
Liga MX | 1 | 1986(México 86) |
Data verified since 1945/1946
Comments