Meyrin 2014/2015
CityMeyrin
Full nameMeyrin FC
Diminutive MFC
Foundation1914
Stadium Stade du Bois-Carré
Official websitehttp://www.fcmeyrin.ch/
Roster Meyrin 2014/2015
Goalkeepers
left on : 01/01/2015
B.date | 16/02/1993 |
Age | 22 years |
Height | 1m86 |
Weight | 75 kg |
left on : 01/07/2019
B.date | 02/10/1986 |
Age | 28 years |
Height | 1m87 |
left on : 01/07/2021
B.date | 04/03/1990 |
Age | 25 years |
left on : 31/08/2015
B.date | 17/11/1993 |
Age | 21 years |
Defenders
left on : 01/01/2016
B.date | 24/07/1984 |
Age | 30 years |
Height | 1m79 |
left on : 01/07/2015
B.date | 09/02/1989 |
Age | 26 years |
left on : 01/07/2015
B.date | 04/03/1995 |
Age | 20 years |
left on : 01/07/2018
B.date | 09/04/1990 |
Age | 25 years |
Height | 1m73 |
Weight | 62 kg |
Midfielders
left on : 01/07/2015
B.date | 23/06/1989 |
Age | 26 years |
Height | 1m84 |
Weight | 78 kg |
left on : 01/01/2019
B.date | 11/02/1993 |
Age | 22 years |
B.date | 21/09/2001 |
Age | 13 years |
left on : 01/07/2016
B.date | 16/09/1992 |
Age | 22 years |
left on : 03/03/2015
B.date | 03/01/1989 |
Age | 26 years |
Height | 1m78 |
Weight | 71 kg |
left on : 01/01/2016
B.date | 06/02/1991 |
Age | 24 years |
Height | 1m76 |
Weight | 73 kg |
left on : 01/01/2015
B.date | 21/05/1993 |
Age | 22 years |
left on : 01/07/2015
B.date | 22/01/1995 |
Age | 20 years |
left on : 01/07/2015
B.date | 01/02/1992 |
Age | 23 years |
Height | 1m74 |
Weight | 66 kg |
Forwards
left on : 01/07/2015
B.date | 27/02/1986 |
Age | 29 years |
Height | 1m86 |
Weight | 77 kg |
left on : 03/02/2015
B.date | 29/12/1992 |
Age | 22 years |
Height | 1m79 |
Weight | 74 kg |
left on : 01/07/2015
B.date | 13/08/1994 |
Age | 20 years |
left on : 01/07/2015
B.date | 26/12/1989 |
Age | 25 years |
left on : 01/07/2016
B.date | 06/05/1994 |
Age | 21 years |
left on : 23/02/2018
B.date | 20/03/1990 |
Age | 25 years |
Height | 1m73 |
Weight | 70 kg |
left on : 01/07/2021
B.date | 05/08/1984 |
Age | 30 years |
Height | 1m77 |
Manager
Transfers: In
Players in | |||||
01/07 | 01/07/2014 | Benhaddouche | |||
01/07 | 01/07/2014 | Maxime Medaglia | Evian TG | ||
01/07 | 01/07/2014 | Paulo Moreira | Lancy | ||
01/07 | 01/07/2014 | D. Prebandier | Unknown | ||
01/07 | 01/07/2014 | Adil Seipi | Nyon | ||
01/07 | 01/07/2014 | Cerruti Vuzi | USTS | ||
01/07 | 01/07/2014 | Hiraç Yagan | RUSG | ||
01/07 | 01/07/2014 | John Zurbrugg | CS Italien | ||
01/10 | 01/10/2014 | Ludovic Paratte | Servette | ||
01/01 | 01/01/2015 | A. da Costa | Signal FC | ||
01/01 | 01/01/2015 | Moustapha Dabo | Free | ||
01/01 | 01/01/2015 | Rolling Iyeti | Etoile Carouge | ||
01/03 | 01/03/2015 | Ibrahim Diallo | Unknown | ||
Players loaned in | |||||
01/07 | 01/07/2014 | Uvejs Selmonaj | Etoile Carouge | Loan | |
04/08 | 04/08/2014 | C. Guedes | Servette | Loan | |
Staff members in | |||||
16/09 | 16/09/2014 | Carlos Alves | Servette | manager |
Transfers: Out
Players out | |||||
01/07 | 01/07/2014 | A. da Costa | Signal FC | ||
01/07 | 01/07/2014 | Andi Iseni | Unknown | ||
01/07 | 01/07/2014 | Karim Khir | Evry FC | ||
01/07 | 01/07/2014 | Daniel Soares | Unknown | ||
01/01 | 01/01/2015 | C. Guedes | Servette | Return from loan | |
01/01 | 01/01/2015 | John Zurbrugg | Veyrier | ||
03/02 | 03/02/2015 | B. Besnard | Servette | ||
03/03 | 03/03/2015 | Hiraç Yagan | Servette | Free | |
Players retired | |||||
01/07 | 01/07/2014 | Sofian A. | Retired | ||
01/07 | 01/07/2014 | J.-P. Lebeau | Retired | ||
Players released | |||||
01/07 | 01/07/2014 | Percy Colque | Free | ||
01/07 | 01/07/2014 | Jonathan Lopez | Free | ||
01/07 | 01/07/2014 | Paulo Pereira | Free | ||
Staff members out | |||||
12/09 | 12/09/2014 | Bruno Codeas | Free | manager |
Comments