Hythe Town 2021/2022
CityHythe
Full nameHythe Town FC
Foundation1911
Stadium Reachfields Stadium
Official websitehttp://www.hythetownfc.co.uk
Roster Hythe Town 2021/2022
Goalkeepers
B.date | 28/08/1990 |
Age | 31 years |
left on : 01/07/2022
B.date | 14/09/1997 |
Age | 24 years |
Defenders
left on : 23/03/2022
B.date | 06/11/1988 |
Age | 33 years |
Height | 1m85 |
Weight | 77 kg |
B.date | 22/05/1991 |
Age | 31 years |
Height | 1m86 |
B.date | 02/01/1992 |
Age | 30 years |
B.date | 07/08/1984 |
Age | 37 years |
left on : 01/07/2022
B.date | 09/12/1984 |
Age | 37 years |
Height | 1m78 |
Midfielders
left on : 01/05/2022
B.date | 25/07/2004 |
Age | 17 years |
Height | 1m87 |
left on : 03/12/2021
B.date | 05/05/1992 |
Age | 30 years |
left on : 19/06/2022
B.date | 04/01/1999 |
Age | 23 years |
Height | 1m76 |
B.date | 04/10/1996 |
Age | 25 years |
Height | 1m73 |
left on : 01/07/2022
B.date | 11/04/2002 |
Age | 20 years |
Forwards
B.date | 25/12/1995 |
Age | 26 years |
Height | 1m78 |
B.date | 19/12/1991 |
Age | 30 years |
Height | 1m80 |
B.date | 08/01/1994 |
Age | 28 years |
left on : 23/11/2021
B.date | 21/05/1997 |
Age | 25 years |
B.date | 20/04/1987 |
Age | 35 years |
Height | 1m81 |
Weight | 75 kg |
left on : 09/11/2021
B.date | 16/12/1997 |
Age | 24 years |
Manager
Staff members
Nathan Elder | Arrived on : 10/09/2019 |
assistant manager | Left on : 16/11/2021 |
Paul Booth | Arrived on : 10/09/2019 |
fitness coach |
Transfers: In
Players in | |||||
01/07 | 01/07/2021 | Noel Leighton | Margate FC | ||
01/07 | 01/07/2021 | Darren Oldaker | Welling | ||
21/07 | 21/07/2021 | Jacob Gilbert | Maidstone | ||
04/08 | 04/08/2021 | Scott Doe | Welling | ||
28/08 | 28/08/2021 | Luke Carey | Ramsgate | ||
31/10 | 31/10/2021 | Henry Newcombe | Faversham | ||
14/11 | 14/11/2021 | Andrew Sesay | T&M | ||
12/02 | 12/02/2022 | Nico Cotton | Ramsgate | ||
Players loaned in | |||||
01/01 | 01/01/2022 | Luca Woodhouse | Tonbridge | Loan | |
Staff members in | |||||
Transfers: Out
Players out | |||||
01/07 | 01/07/2021 | Dean Beckwith | Cray Wanderers | ||
06/08 | 06/08/2021 | B.-K. Dembele | Corinthian | ||
09/11 | 09/11/2021 | Noel Leighton | Three Bridges | ||
23/11 | 23/11/2021 | Andrew Sesay | Hastings United | ||
30/11 | 30/11/2021 | Nathan Gordon | T&M | ||
03/12 | 03/12/2021 | Alex Flisher | Sittingbourne | ||
23/03 | 23/03/2022 | Scott Doe | WTFC | ||
Players retired | |||||
15/07 | 15/07/2021 | Tom Wynter | Retired | ||
Staff members out | |||||
16/11 | 16/11/2021 | Steven Watt | Free | manager |
Comments