Central Norte 2015
Roster Central Norte 2015
Goalkeepers
left on : 01/01/2018
B.date | 01/06/1987 |
Age | 28 years |
Defenders
left on : 30/06/2015
B.date | 27/12/1987 |
Age | 27 years |
Height | 1m80 |
Weight | 80 kg |
left on : 01/07/2015
B.date | 25/10/1977 |
Age | 37 years |
Height | 1m79 |
left on : 01/01/2016
B.date | 03/03/1992 |
Age | 23 years |
Height | 1m69 |
Weight | 64 kg |
left on : 01/07/2016
B.date | 08/10/1985 |
Age | 29 years |
B.date | 04/10/1987 |
Age | 27 years |
left on : 01/07/2016
B.date | 30/09/1988 |
Age | 26 years |
Height | 1m78 |
Weight | 75 kg |
Midfielders
left on : 01/07/2020
B.date | 16/10/1985 |
Age | 29 years |
left on : 01/01/2016
B.date | 06/10/1980 |
Age | 34 years |
left on : 01/01/2021
B.date | 15/03/1991 |
Age | 24 years |
left on : 01/07/2015
B.date | 08/09/1992 |
Age | 22 years |
left on : 01/02/2021
B.date | 29/09/1996 |
Age | 18 years |
left on : 12/07/2016
B.date | 22/06/1992 |
Age | 23 years |
Forwards
B.date | 11/03/1987 |
Age | 28 years |
left on : 01/01/2016
B.date | 19/10/1982 |
Age | 32 years |
left on : 01/07/2015
B.date | 15/07/1986 |
Age | 28 years |
Height | 1m76 |
left on : 01/07/2015
B.date | 11/07/1988 |
Age | 26 years |
Height | 1m83 |
left on : 01/07/2015
B.date | 02/01/1989 |
Age | 26 years |
Height | 1m68 |
Weight | 60 kg |
left on : 01/07/2016
B.date | 11/03/1993 |
Age | 22 years |
left on : 01/07/2015
B.date | 09/04/1985 |
Age | 30 years |
Height | 1m79 |
left on : 07/07/2019
B.date | 12/02/1985 |
Age | 30 years |
left on : 01/07/2016
B.date | 30/09/1982 |
Age | 32 years |
Staff members
Martín Cicotello | Arrived on : 20/10/2014 |
assistant manager | Left on : 28/07/2015 |
Transfers: In
Players in | |||||
01/01 | 01/01/2015 | Favio Alvarez | Talleres | ||
01/01 | 01/01/2015 | Diego Nuñez | Central Córdoba SdE | ||
01/01 | 01/01/2015 | E. H. Vargas | Crucero | ||
01/05 | 01/05/2015 | Edgardo Brittes | Almagro | ||
01/07 | 01/07/2015 | M. Lopez |
Transfers: Out
Players out | |||||
01/01 | 01/01/2015 | Altamirano | Almagro | ||
01/01 | 01/01/2015 | Fausto Apaza | Gim y Tiro | ||
01/01 | 01/01/2015 | Juan Zerrizuela | Unknown | ||
30/06 | 30/06/2015 | Fabio Gimenez | Gim y Tiro | ||
01/07 | 01/07/2015 | Mauro Boaglio | Cañuelas | ||
01/07 | 01/07/2015 | Carlos Fretes | Unknown | ||
01/07 | 01/07/2015 | Pedro Goyheche | Unknown | ||
01/07 | 01/07/2015 | Juan Perillo | Guemes Bariloche | ||
01/07 | 01/07/2015 | Villar Rodriguez | AHZ | ||
Players retired | |||||
01/07 | 01/07/2015 | Emanuel Torres | Retired | ||
Staff members out | |||||
28/07 | 28/07/2015 | M. Cicotello | Unknown | assistant manager |
Comments