Crucero del Norte 2010/2011
CityGarupá
Full nameClub Mutual Crucero del Norte
Diminutive Crucero
Foundation2003
Stadium Estadio Comandante Andrés Guacurarí
Official websitehttps://www.clubcrucerodelnorte.com.ar
Roster Crucero del Norte 2010/2011
Goalkeepers
left on : 08/10/2010
B.date | 18/09/1974 |
Age | 36 years |
Height | 1m86 |
Weight | 82 kg |
left on : 01/07/2012
B.date | 15/01/1984 |
Age | 27 years |
Height | 1m85 |
left on : 01/07/2011
B.date | 03/01/1992 |
Age | 19 years |
Height | 1m85 |
Weight | 79 kg |
Defenders
left on : 03/07/2012
B.date | 07/07/1977 |
Age | 33 years |
Height | 1m83 |
Weight | 81 kg |
left on : 28/02/2011
B.date | 05/11/1979 |
Age | 31 years |
Height | 1m82 |
Weight | 83 kg |
left on : 01/01/2012
B.date | 20/10/1985 |
Age | 25 years |
Height | 1m92 |
B.date | 25/04/1980 |
Age | 31 years |
left on : 01/07/2011
B.date | 20/04/1981 |
Age | 30 years |
Height | 1m81 |
left on : 01/07/2011
B.date | 01/03/1982 |
Age | 29 years |
Midfielders
left on : 01/01/2011
B.date | 27/02/1974 |
Age | 37 years |
left on : 29/07/2014
B.date | 11/02/1976 |
Age | 35 years |
Height | 1m71 |
Weight | 68 kg |
left on : 30/06/2014
B.date | 23/04/1984 |
Age | 27 years |
left on : 01/07/2013
B.date | 26/06/1984 |
Age | 27 years |
left on : 01/07/2011
B.date | 11/03/1982 |
Age | 29 years |
left on : 01/07/2011
B.date | 12/02/1977 |
Age | 34 years |
Forwards
left on : 01/07/2012
B.date | 10/12/1987 |
Age | 23 years |
Height | 1m83 |
left on : 01/01/2011
B.date | 30/03/1983 |
Age | 28 years |
Height | 1m81 |
left on : 01/07/2012
B.date | 04/03/1973 |
Age | 38 years |
Height | 1m68 |
Weight | 68 kg |
left on : 01/07/2011
B.date | 11/05/1985 |
Age | 26 years |
Height | 1m82 |
Weight | 77 kg |
B.date | 19/05/1991 |
Age | 20 years |
Height | 1m67 |
Weight | 63 kg |
Manager
Transfers: In
Players in | |||||
01/07 | 01/07/2010 | A. R. Abadie | Libertad de Sunchales | ||
01/07 | 01/07/2010 | G. Hernando | Platense | ||
01/07 | 01/07/2010 | S. Monesterolo | Atenas Río Cuarto | ||
01/07 | 01/07/2010 | P. A. Nieva | Platense | ||
01/07 | 01/07/2010 | L. Rodríguez | Juve Antoniana | ||
26/12 | 26/12/2010 | L. I. Varaldo | Deportivo Guaymallén | ||
01/01 | 01/01/2011 | Aníbal Medina | San José | ||
Staff members in | |||||
01/12 | 01/12/2010 | Pedro Dechat | manager |
Transfers: Out
Players out | |||||
01/07 | 01/07/2010 | Juan Matto | Huancayo | ||
01/07 | 01/07/2010 | F. Perezlindo | Unknown | ||
01/07 | 01/07/2010 | Sergio Recalde | GAF | ||
01/07 | 01/07/2010 | Rodríguez | Chaco For Ever | ||
01/07 | 01/07/2010 | C. Taborda | Rivadavia L | ||
01/07 | 01/07/2010 | G. Tomassini | Mineros | ||
13/07 | 13/07/2010 | G. R. Del Bono | Unknown | Free | |
08/10 | 08/10/2010 | G. Hernando | Unknown | ||
01/01 | 01/01/2011 | Héctor Franco | Brown | ||
01/01 | 01/01/2011 | Derlis Maidana | Brown | ||
01/01 | 01/01/2011 | S. Monesterolo | Desamparados | ||
28/02 | 28/02/2011 | P. A. Nieva | Guillermo Brown | ||
Players retired | |||||
01/07 | 01/07/2010 | Carlos Duré | Retired |
Comments