Rápido de Bouzas 2013/2014
CityVigo
Full nameClub Rápido de Bouzas
Diminutive Rápido Bouzas
Foundation1914
Stadium Baltasar Pujales
Official websitehttp://www.rapidodebouzas.com
Roster Rápido de Bouzas 2013/2014
Goalkeepers
left on : 01/07/2014
B.date | 22/10/1990 |
Age | 23 years |
Height | 1m85 |
Defenders
left on : 01/01/2015
B.date | 24/11/1985 |
Age | 28 years |
Height | 1m81 |
Weight | 77 kg |
left on : 01/07/2015
B.date | 24/07/1992 |
Age | 21 years |
left on : 30/06/2014
B.date | 01/02/1994 |
Age | 20 years |
left on : 01/07/2019
B.date | 19/03/1992 |
Age | 22 years |
Midfielders
left on : 01/07/2016
B.date | 28/02/1991 |
Age | 23 years |
Height | 1m72 |
Weight | 67 kg |
left on : 01/07/2016
B.date | 03/01/1993 |
Age | 21 years |
Height | 1m72 |
Weight | 65 kg |
left on : 01/01/2015
B.date | 17/11/1990 |
Age | 23 years |
Height | 1m82 |
Weight | 76 kg |
Forwards
left on : 21/07/2015
B.date | 19/09/1996 |
Age | 17 years |
Height | 1m73 |
Weight | 68 kg |
left on : 01/07/2014
B.date | 06/05/1991 |
Age | 23 years |
Height | 1m78 |
Manager
Staff members
Javier Maté | Arrived on : 31/05/2010 |
Sporting Director | Left on : 01/07/2017 |
Transfers: In
Players in | |||||
01/07 | 01/07/2013 | Uru | Villalonga | ||
01/07 | 01/07/2013 | Miki Villar | |||
08/07 | 08/07/2013 | David Sestelo | Pontevedra | ||
23/07 | 23/07/2013 | Carlos Hortal | Compostela | ||
25/07 | 25/07/2013 | Gabi Misa | Coruxo | ||
01/08 | 01/08/2013 | David Castro | Celta Vigo B | ||
28/09 | 28/09/2013 | Sergio Santos | Celta Vigo B | Free | |
Players loaned in | |||||
19/07 | 19/07/2013 | Oki | Celta Vigo B | Loan | |
20/07 | 20/07/2013 | Pablo García | Celta Vigo B | Loan |
Transfers: Out
Players out | |||||
30/06 | 30/06/2013 | Aitor Gómez | Unknown | ||
01/07 | 01/07/2013 | Fidi | As Pontes | ||
01/07 | 01/07/2013 | Óscar | Coruxo | ||
08/07 | 08/07/2013 | Aarón | Ourense | Free | |
08/08 | 08/08/2013 | Pablo Carnero | Salamanque AC | Free | |
Players retired | |||||
01/07 | 01/07/2013 | Marcos | Retired | ||
01/07 | 01/07/2013 | Nacho Franco | Retired | ||
01/07 | 01/07/2013 | R. Páramos | Retired |
Comments